MN HF641 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Backer
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Backer
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Right to carry without a permit provided, and optional permit to carry provided.
Title
Right to carry without a permit provided, and optional permit to carry provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Author added Backer |
2023-03-09 | House | Author added Murphy |
2023-03-06 | House | Author added Hudson |
2023-02-15 | House | Author added Gillman |
2023-01-25 | House | Author added Daniels |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF881 (Similar To) 2023-01-27 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety