MN HF630 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Taxes
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Taxes
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Child out-of-home placement cost aid under the Indian Child Welfare Act provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Child out-of-home placement cost aid under the Indian Child Welfare Act provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Taxes |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2017-03-06 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2017-02-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2017-02-09 | House | Author added Grossell. |
2017-02-02 | House | Author added Layman. |
2017-01-30 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF503 (Similar To) 2017-02-13 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes