MN HF622 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-22 - Amendment reconsidered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Public land, buildings, and other capital improvement spending authorized; previous appropriations modified; new programs established and existing programs modified; bonds issued; and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public land, buildings, and other capital improvement spending authorized; previous appropriations modified; new programs established and existing programs modified; bonds issued; and money appropriated.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-22 - House - House: (Y: 91 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-22 - House - House: (Y: 57 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 53 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsidered (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House: Passage (Y: 69 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-22SenateAmendment reconsidered
2016-05-22SenateReconsidered vote: 50-13
2016-05-22SenateThird reading Passed vote: 53-12
2016-05-22SenateAmended
2016-05-22SenateSecond reading
2016-05-22SenateUrgency declared rules suspended
2016-05-22SenateIntroduction and first reading
2016-05-22SenateReceived from House
2016-05-22HouseBill was passed as amended vote: 91-39
2016-05-22HouseThird reading as amended
2016-05-22HouseAmended
2016-05-22HouseMotion prevailed
2016-05-22HouseMotion for reconsideration of third reading
2016-05-22HouseMotion did not prevail vote: 57-75
2016-05-22HouseMotion for reconsideration of third reading
2016-05-22HouseThird reading as amended
2016-05-22HouseAmended
2016-05-22HouseMotion prevailed
2016-05-22HouseMotion for reconsideration third reading
2016-05-22HouseMotion prevailed
2016-05-22HouseMotion to take from table
2016-05-19HouseMotion prevailed
2016-05-19HouseMotion to lay on the table
2016-05-19HouseMotion prevailed
2016-05-19HouseMotion for reconsideration
2016-05-19HouseBill was not passed 81 votes needed for passage
2016-05-19HouseThird reading
2016-05-19HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 19, 2016
2016-05-18HouseSecond reading
2016-05-18HouseJoint rule 2.03 waived
2016-05-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2016-05-18HouseJoint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
2016-05-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2016-03-29HouseAuthor added Moran.
2015-05-16HouseSecond reading
2015-05-16HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2015-04-21HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2015-04-16HouseAuthor added Hausman.
2015-02-05HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment

Same As/Similar To

SF1988 (Similar To) 2016-05-18 - Second reading

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0622&ssn=0&y=2015
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF622&version=0&session=ls89&session_year=2015&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF622&version=1&session=ls89&session_year=2015&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF622&version=2&session=ls89&session_year=2015&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF622&version=3&session=ls89&session_year=2015&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=89&billnum=HF0622&session_number=0&year=2015&id=20592
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls89&number=8177
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls89&number=8176
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=89&billnum=HF0622&session_number=0&year=2015&id=20652
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=89&billnum=HF0622&session_number=0&year=2015&id=20653

Bill Comments

feedback