MN HF6 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Author added Garofalo as chief author.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Author added Garofalo as chief author.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public Utilities Commission membership modified.
Title
Public Utilities Commission membership modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Rep. Dan Fabian [R] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] | Rep. Jim Newberger [R] |
Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Author added Garofalo as chief author. |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
2017-01-11 | House | Author added Ecklund. |
2017-01-09 | House | Authors added Kiel, Newberger, and Lueck. |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |