MN HF598 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Author added Koznick
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Author added Koznick
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
St. Paul; International Institute of Minnesota renovation and expansion funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
St. Paul; International Institute of Minnesota renovation and expansion funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] |
Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. Jon Koznick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Author added Koznick |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-03-07 | House | Returned by Chair to Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Urdahl |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added Lillie |
2019-02-04 | House | Authors added Mariani and Becker-Finn |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF649 (Similar To) 2019-01-31 - Referred to Capital Investment