MN HF579 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Bahr
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Bahr
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; use of force in defense of home and person law clarified, self-defense and defense of home laws codified and extended, duty to retreat in self-defense outside home eliminated, self-defense dwelling boundaries expanded, presumption created in case of person entering dwelling or vehicle by stealth or force, and rights defending against entry of occupied vehicle extended.
Title
Firearms; use of force in defense of home and person law clarified, self-defense and defense of home laws codified and extended, duty to retreat in self-defense outside home eliminated, self-defense dwelling boundaries expanded, presumption created in case of person entering dwelling or vehicle by stealth or force, and rights defending against entry of occupied vehicle extended.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Bahr |
2021-02-25 | House | Authors added Lucero |
2021-02-15 | House | Author added Munson |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |