MN HF57 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 53
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Synthetic cannabinoid sale or possession crime established; synthetic cannabinoids, 2C-E, and 2C-I added to the list of Schedule I controlled substances; definition of "analog" added; analog of a Schedule I or II controlled substance provided to be considered a Schedule I controlled substance; weight of fluid used in a water pipe established when determining weight or amount of controlled substance; and Board of Pharmacy authorized to reschedule certain drugs only pursuant to law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Synthetic cannabinoid sale or possession crime established; synthetic cannabinoids, 2C-E, and 2C-I added to the list of Schedule I controlled substances; definition of "analog" added; analog of a Schedule I or II controlled substance provided to be considered a Schedule I controlled substance; weight of fluid used in a water pipe established when determining weight or amount of controlled substance; and Board of Pharmacy authorized to reschedule certain drugs only pursuant to law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-19 - House - Repassage, as amended by Conference committee (Y: 124 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - Passage (Y: 124 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-24 Secretary of State Chapter 53
2011-05-24 Governor's action Approval
2011-05-24 Governor approval
2011-05-21 Presented to Governor
2011-05-20SenateThird reading vote: 62-0
2011-05-20SenateSenate adopted CC report and repassed bill
2011-05-20SenateConference committee report, delete everything
2011-05-20SenateHouse adopted HCC report and repassed bill
2011-05-20HouseSenate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 62-0
2011-05-19HouseBill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 124-8
2011-05-19HouseThird reading as amended by Conference
2011-05-19HouseHouse adopted conference committee report
2011-05-19HouseConference committee report, delete everything
2011-05-18SenateSenate conferees Hall; Pappas; Nelson
2011-05-18HouseSenate conferees Hall, Pappas, Nelson
2011-05-18HouseSenate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed
2011-05-17SenateSenate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed
2011-05-17SenateHouse conferees Kriesel; McNamara; Gauthier
2011-05-17SenateHouse not concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2011-05-16HouseHouse conferees Kriesel, McNamara, Gauthier
2011-05-16HouseHouse refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2011-05-16HouseReturned from Senate with amendment
2011-05-12SenateThird reading Passed vote: 65-0
2011-05-12SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2011-04-14SenateSecond reading
2011-04-14SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2011-02-28SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety
2011-02-28SenateIntroduction and first reading
2011-02-28SenateReceived from House
2011-02-24HouseBill was passed as amended vote: 124-4
2011-02-24HouseThird reading as amended
2011-02-24HouseAmended
2011-02-24HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day
2011-02-07HouseSecond reading
2011-02-07HouseCommittee report, to pass
2011-01-26HouseAuthor added Morrow
2011-01-24HouseAuthors added Atkins, Lanning, Barrett and Scott
2011-01-24HouseCommittee report, to pass and re-refer to Judiciary Policy and Finance
2011-01-20HouseAuthors added O'Driscoll, Gruenhagen and Myhra
2011-01-18HouseAuthor added Nelson
2011-01-13HouseAuthors added Crawford, McNamara, Holberg and Dettmer
2011-01-10HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0057&ssn=0&y=2011
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF57&version=0&session=ls87
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF57&version=1&session=ls87
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF57&version=1&type=ue&session=ls87
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF57&version=2&type=ue&session=ls87
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF57&version=2&session=ls87
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF0057&type=ccr&session=ls87
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/laws/?id=53&year=2011&type=0
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=87&billnum=HF0057&session_number=0&year=2011&id=52
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=87&billnum=HF0057&session_number=0&year=2011&id=386

Bill Comments

feedback