MN HF562 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Governor's action Veto Chapter 73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Governor's action Veto Chapter 73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Manufactured home parks water and sewer charges regulated, and air admittances valve prohibition repealed.
Title
Manufactured home parks water and sewer charges regulated, and air admittances valve prohibition repealed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-21 - House - Repassage, as amended by the Senate (Y: 68 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - Sanders - Motion to Concur (Y: 67 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - Passage (Y: 115 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - Sanders - Motion to Concur (Y: 67 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - Passage (Y: 115 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Governor's action Veto Chapter 73 | |
2011-05-23 | Presented to Governor | |
2011-05-21 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 68-65 |
2011-05-21 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2011-05-21 | House | Motion prevailed vote: 67-66 |
2011-05-21 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2011-05-21 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2011-05-21 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 39-26 |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2011-05-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-05-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Received from House |
2011-04-11 | House | Bill was passed vote: 115-14 |
2011-04-11 | House | Third reading |
2011-04-07 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2011-03-14 | House | Second reading |
2011-03-14 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2011-02-28 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Civil Law |
2011-02-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |