MN HF559 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Author added Nornes.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Author added Nornes.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Income medical assistance eligibility limit, asset limits, and excess income standard for the blind, disabled, and elderly increased.
Title
Income medical assistance eligibility limit, asset limits, and excess income standard for the blind, disabled, and elderly increased.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Author added Nornes. |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2015-03-18 | House | Author added Torkelson. |
2015-03-17 | House | Author added Uglem. |
2015-03-16 | House | Author added Johnson, C. |
2015-02-25 | House | Author added Persell. |
2015-02-19 | House | Author added Bly. |
2015-02-18 | House | Author added Lillie. |
2015-02-16 | House | Author added Yarusso. |
2015-02-05 | House | Authors added Fischer and Schultz. |
2015-02-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF543 (Similar To) 2015-03-05 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance