MN HF550 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Climate justice instruction required by school districts and charter schools.
Title
Climate justice instruction required by school districts and charter schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Carlson |
2022-02-28 | House | Author added Pinto |
2022-02-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance |
2022-02-21 | House | Author added Hassan |
2021-03-04 | House | Authors added Liebling and Feist |
2021-02-25 | House | Authors added Her, Long, Moller, Lee, Lippert |
2021-02-04 | House | Author added Edelson |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF666 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Author added Isaacson