MN HF544 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce Finance and Policy
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Pharmacy benefit manager and health carrier requirements established related to clinician-administered drugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy benefit manager and health carrier requirements established related to clinician-administered drugs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-08HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce Finance and Policy
2023-02-27HouseMotion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Health Finance and Policy
2023-01-26HouseAuthor added Curran
2023-01-23HouseAuthor added Kotyza-Witthuhn
2023-01-19HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF482 (Similar To) 2023-03-16 - General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback