MN HF543 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Xiong, J.
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Somali arts and cultural heritage program funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Somali arts and cultural heritage program funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseAuthor added Xiong, J.
2019-03-11HouseAuthor stricken Baker
2019-02-21HouseAuthor stricken Urdahl
2019-01-31HouseReferred by Chair to Legacy Finance Division
2019-01-31HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF658 (Similar To) 2019-02-21 - Author stricken Lang

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback