MN HF53 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-14 - Author added Myhra
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-14 - Author added Myhra
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Legislative three-fifths vote required to pass the school aid payment percentage below 90.
Title
Legislative three-fifths vote required to pass the school aid payment percentage below 90.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | House | Author added Myhra |
2013-02-13 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2013-01-22 | House | Authors added Wills and Petersburg |
2013-01-17 | House | Author added Anderson, S. |
2013-01-14 | House | Authors added Kieffer, Albright and Quam |
2013-01-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |