MN HF52 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Author added Stephenson
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Author added Stephenson
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public comments required at all public bodies open meetings, including those conducted by electronic means.
Title
Public comments required at all public bodies open meetings, including those conducted by electronic means.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
Rep. Donald Raleigh [R] | Rep. John Heinrich [R] | Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Author added Stephenson |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred by Chair to Local Government Division |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF180 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Authors added Abeler; Bigham; Hoffman