MN HF52 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation; federal provision conformity and nonconformity provided, and individual income tax and other miscellaneous provisions modified.
Title
Taxation; federal provision conformity and nonconformity provided, and individual income tax and other miscellaneous provisions modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Robbins |
2019-02-11 | House | Author added Hertaus |
2019-01-28 | House | Author added Layman |
2019-01-24 | House | Author added Albright |
2019-01-17 | House | Authors added Garofalo, Nornes, Miller, Scott and Haley |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF5 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2125