MN HF518 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Author added Franson.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Author added Franson.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Complex pediatric home care nursing category established for home care nursing services, and payment rate for home care nursing services increased.
Title
Complex pediatric home care nursing category established for home care nursing services, and payment rate for home care nursing services increased.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | Author added Franson. |
2017-02-13 | House | Author added Moran. |
2017-02-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2017-01-30 | House | Author added Pierson. |
2017-01-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF319 (Similar To) 2017-01-23 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy