MN HF511 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Plastic bags and similar items prohibition on local ordinances repealed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Plastic bags and similar items prohibition on local ordinances repealed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseAuthor added Kotyza-Witthuhn
2019-03-20HouseAuthor added Edelson
2019-03-18HouseSecond reading
2019-03-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-03-11HouseAuthor added Xiong, J.
2019-02-25HouseReferred by Chair to Subcommittee on Local Government
2019-02-07HouseAuthor added Lee
2019-02-04HouseAuthor added Becker-Finn
2019-01-31HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SF1903 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Author added Marty

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback