MN HF504 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Secretary of State Chapter 15 04/22/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Secretary of State Chapter 15 04/22/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinsurance association prefunded limit eliminated.
Title
Reinsurance association prefunded limit eliminated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - House - House: Passage (Y: 124 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Secretary of State Chapter 15 04/22/13 | |
2013-04-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2013-04-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2013-04-22 | Governor approval | |
2013-04-18 | Presented to Governor | |
2013-04-17 | House | Returned from Senate |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 64-1 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Special Order |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF372 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF372, now on General Orders |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-04-10 | House | Bill was passed vote: 124-7 |
2013-04-10 | House | Third reading |
2013-04-08 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2013-03-18 | House | Second reading |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2013-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Jobs and Economic Development Finance and Policy |