MN HF5 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

MNsure; commerce commissioner required to seek federal approval, salary limit imposed, health plan approval rates specified, health carrier notification of enrollment information required, individual coverage option provided, product lines prohibited, small business health care tax credit expansion proposal required, MNsure organizational changes made, background checks required on navigators, and exemptions removed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MNsure; commerce commissioner required to seek federal approval, salary limit imposed, health plan approval rates specified, health carrier notification of enrollment information required, individual coverage option provided, product lines prohibited, small business health care tax credit expansion proposal required, MNsure organizational changes made, background checks required on navigators, and exemptions removed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-19HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
2015-03-16HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy
2015-03-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Regulatory Reform
2015-01-20HouseAuthor added Nornes.
2015-01-14HouseAuthor added Lueck.
2015-01-12HouseAuthors added Dettmer, Schomacker, and Uglem
2015-01-08HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform

Same As/Similar To

SF390 (Similar To) 2015-01-29 - Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback