MN HF5 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-20 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed State Government Finance vote: 68-59
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-20 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed State Government Finance vote: 68-59
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
State employee salary and wage freeze instituted.
Title
State employee salary and wage freeze instituted.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-20 - House - Recall and Re-referral (Y: 68 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-20 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed State Government Finance vote: 68-59 |
2011-01-18 | House | Authors added Leidiger, Stensrud, Drazkowski and Shimanski |
2011-01-13 | House | Authors added Myhra, Holberg, Murdock, Dettmer and Torkelson |
2011-01-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections |