MN HF495 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Residential lease requirements amended.
Title
Residential lease requirements amended.
Sponsors
Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] |
Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] |
Rep. Brad Tabke [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - House: Passage (Y: 71 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Johnson - Amendment - H0495A11 (Y: 52 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Pierson motion - Lay on the Table (Y: 54 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Munson - Amendment - A19-0316 (Y: 56 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Munson - Amendment - A19-0143 (Y: 53 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Munson - Amendment - A19-0129 (Y: 55 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Johnson - Amendment - H0495A11 (Y: 52 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Pierson motion - Lay on the Table (Y: 54 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Munson - Amendment - A19-0316 (Y: 56 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Munson - Amendment - A19-0143 (Y: 53 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Munson - Amendment - A19-0129 (Y: 55 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF125 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF125, now on General Orders |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-04-01 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2019-04-01 | House | Motion did not prevail |
2019-04-01 | House | Motion to re-refer Ways and Means |
2019-04-01 | House | Third reading as amended |
2019-04-01 | House | Motion did not prevail |
2019-04-01 | House | Motion to lay on the table |
2019-04-01 | House | Amended |
2019-03-28 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 1, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Fischer |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF125 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF495