MN HF488 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Author added Sauke.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Author added Sauke.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health care availability and affordability for every Minnesotan guaranteed; Minnesota Health Plan, Minnesota Health Board, Minnesota Health Fund, Office of Health Quality and Planning, ombudsman for patient advocacy, and auditor general for the Minnesota Heath Plan established; 1332 waiver requested; rulemaking authorized; and money appropriated.
Title
Health care availability and affordability for every Minnesotan guaranteed; Minnesota Health Plan, Minnesota Health Board, Minnesota Health Fund, Office of Health Quality and Planning, ombudsman for patient advocacy, and auditor general for the Minnesota Heath Plan established; 1332 waiver requested; rulemaking authorized; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Author added Sauke. |
2017-03-23 | House | Author added Wagenius. |
2017-01-30 | House | Authors added Sandstede, Hausman, Clark, and Hornstein. |
2017-01-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF220 (Similar To) 2017-01-19 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy