MN HF484 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Metropolitan agricultural preserves expiration modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Metropolitan agricultural preserves expiration modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
2019-03-27HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-03-21HouseReferred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
2019-03-21HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-01-28HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture and Food Finance and Policy Division

Same As/Similar To

SF1368 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback