MN HF4740 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veteran housing developed by Contained Solutions funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Veteran housing developed by Contained Solutions funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Masin [D] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] |
Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Author added Bierman |
2022-04-28 | House | Author added Franson |
2022-04-27 | House | Author added Davids |
2022-04-26 | House | Author added Moran |
2022-04-07 | House | Author added Nelson, M. |
2022-04-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4481 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Author added Newton