MN HF47 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Agricultural fertilizer research and education fee, the Minnesota Agricultural Fertilizer Research and Education Council, the Minnesota agricultural fertilizer research and education program, and the agricultural fertilizer research and education account extended by ten years.
Title
Agricultural fertilizer research and education fee, the Minnesota Agricultural Fertilizer Research and Education Council, the Minnesota agricultural fertilizer research and education program, and the agricultural fertilizer research and education account extended by ten years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations |
2019-02-12 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-01-17 | House | Authors added Poston and Nornes |
2019-01-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Agriculture and Food Finance and Policy Division |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF635 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Second reading