MN HF47 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Author added Barr, R.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Author added Barr, R.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dakota County; Byllesby Dam funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Dakota County; Byllesby Dam funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Sen. Erin Maye Quade [D] | Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] |
Rep. Sandra Masin [D] | Rep. Matt Bliss [R] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] | Rep. Regina Barr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Author added Barr, R. |
2017-02-06 | House | Author added Jurgens. |
2017-01-19 | House | Author added Bliss. |
2017-01-09 | House | Authors added Hansen, Maye Quade, Halverson, and Masin. |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF48 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Author stricken Schoen