MN HF4643 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Author added Boe
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Author added Boe
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small business loan transfers modified, emergency small business grant and loan funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Small business loan transfers modified, emergency small business grant and loan funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] | Rep. Sandy Layman [R] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] |
Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | Author added Boe |
2020-05-09 | House | Authors added Layman, Bennett, and Urdahl |
2020-05-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF4481 (Similar To) 2020-05-13 - Senate file first reading, referred to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division