MN HF463 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Author added Youakim.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Author added Youakim.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alternative procedure for absentee voting modified.
Title
Alternative procedure for absentee voting modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | House | Author added Youakim. |
2017-01-26 | House | Authors added Applebaum, Bernardy, and Halverson. |
2017-01-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF500 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Author added Bigham