MN HF46 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Author added Ecklund
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Author added Ecklund
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Custody and parenting time presumptions modified.
Title
Custody and parenting time presumptions modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Hertaus [R] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] | Rep. Jack Considine [D] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] |
Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Ecklund |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Baker |
2019-02-11 | House | Author added Brand |
2019-02-07 | House | Author added Considine |
2019-01-31 | House | Author added Munson |
2019-01-28 | House | Author added Jurgens |
2019-01-22 | House | Author added Elkins |
2019-01-17 | House | Author added Franson |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF1853 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy