MN HF458 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 58 05/13/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 58 05/13/13
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Formaldehyde banned in children's products.
Title
Formaldehyde banned in children's products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-08 - House - House: Repassage, as amended by the Senate (Y: 126 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - House: Passage (Y: 113 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - House: Passage (Y: 113 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Secretary of State Chapter 58 05/13/13 | |
2013-05-13 | Governor's action Approval | |
2013-05-09 | Presented to Governor | |
2013-05-08 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 126-7 |
2013-05-08 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2013-05-08 | House | Motion prevailed |
2013-05-08 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2013-05-08 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2013-05-08 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 38-23 |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF357 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF357, now on General Orders |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-04-26 | House | Bill was passed vote: 113-13 |
2013-04-26 | House | Third reading |
2013-04-25 | House | Author added Schoen |
2013-04-24 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, April 26th, 2013 |
2013-03-21 | House | Second reading |
2013-03-21 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2013-03-11 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2013-02-28 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Policy |
2013-02-25 | House | Authors added Liebling and Lillie |
2013-02-21 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2013-02-18 | House | Author added Dehn, R. |
2013-02-13 | House | Authors added Bernardy, Clark, Laine and Paymar |
2013-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |