MN HF4579 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
COVID-19; contact tracing, case investigation, and follow-up services for persons with COVID-19 established; reports required; and money appropriated.
Title
COVID-19; contact tracing, case investigation, and follow-up services for persons with COVID-19 established; reports required; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-05-07 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-05-07 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-04-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF4500 (Similar To) 2020-05-16 - Comm report: Amend previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended; re-refer to Rules and Administration