MN HF4556 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - Returned from Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

COVID-19; state government deadlines extended; health expenses covered; temporary emergency authority provided; electronic communication, applicants, and signature use expanded; Second Harvest Heartland grants funding provided; forecast adjustments made; and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19; state government deadlines extended; health expenses covered; temporary emergency authority provided; electronic communication, applicants, and signature use expanded; Second Harvest Heartland grants funding provided; forecast adjustments made; and money appropriated.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-14 - House - House: H. F. No. 4556 (Y: 103 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House: H. F No. 4556 (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-17HouseReturned from Senate
2020-04-16 Secretary of State Chapter 74 04/15/2020
2020-04-15 Governor's action Approval
2020-04-15 Secretary of State, Filed
2020-04-15 Governor approval
2020-04-14 Presented to Governor
2020-04-14SenateThird reading Passed
2020-04-14SenateSecond reading
2020-04-14SenateUrgency declared rules suspended
2020-04-14SenateIntroduction and first reading
2020-04-14SenateReceived from House
2020-04-14HouseBill was passed
2020-04-14HouseThird reading
2020-04-14HouseAmendments offered
2020-04-14HouseSecond reading
2020-04-14HouseRules suspended, urgency declared
2020-04-14HouseIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

SF4462 (Similar To) 2020-04-14 - See HF4556

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback