MN HF4550 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-15 - Author added Koznick
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-15 - Author added Koznick
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Task force established to advise commissioner of Pollution Control Agency on ways to increase recovery of critical materials from end-of-life products, and report required.
Title
Task force established to advise commissioner of Pollution Control Agency on ways to increase recovery of critical materials from end-of-life products, and report required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Author added Koznick |
2024-04-04 | House | Author added Brand |
2024-03-25 | House | Author added Pursell |
2024-03-21 | House | Author added Hollins |
2024-03-20 | House | Author added Finke |
2024-03-18 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4523 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Author added Kunesh