MN HF4542 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Author added Novotny
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Author added Novotny
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Special license plates for firefighters who are also emergency medical technicians authorized.
Title
Special license plates for firefighters who are also emergency medical technicians authorized.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House | Author added Novotny |
2024-03-07 | House | Author added Knudsen |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3855 (Similar To) 2024-02-19 - Referred to Transportation