MN HF452 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Author added Drazkowski
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Author added Drazkowski
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Statutory immunization requirement exemption provided for sincerely held religious belief.
Title
Statutory immunization requirement exemption provided for sincerely held religious belief.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | House | Author added Drazkowski |
2022-01-31 | House | Author added Poston |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF292 (Similar To) 2021-01-25 - Referred to Education Finance and Policy