MN HF450 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Authors added Frazier, Long, and Hassan
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Right to counsel provided in public housing eviction actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Right to counsel provided in public housing eviction actions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04HouseAuthors added Frazier, Long, and Hassan
2021-02-18HouseAuthors added Howard and Vang
2021-02-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
2021-02-01HouseAuthor added Becker-Finn
2021-01-28HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1290 (Similar To) 2021-02-22 - Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback