MN HF4460 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Author added Bernardy.
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Video game loot box sales prohibited.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Video game loot box sales prohibited.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-20HouseAuthor added Bernardy.
2018-05-02HouseAuthor added Freiberg.
2018-04-30HouseAuthors added Mariani and Franke.
2018-04-25HouseAuthors added Schultz and Maye Quade.
2018-04-24HouseAuthor added Lohmer.
2018-04-23HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform

Same As/Similar To

SF4042 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Author added Klein

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback