MN HF446 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Building and construction contracts and indemnification agreements regulated.
Title
Building and construction contracts and indemnification agreements regulated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Second reading |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2013-02-21 | House | Author added FitzSimmons |
2013-02-20 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Civil Law |
2013-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |