MN HF4459 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 30-3)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-20 - Author stricken Whelan.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-20 - Author stricken Whelan.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sexual harassment definition clarified.
Title
Sexual harassment definition clarified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-20 | House | Author stricken Whelan. |
2018-05-03 | House | Second reading |
2018-05-03 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2018-05-03 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-05-01 | House | Author stricken Runbeck. |
2018-04-30 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2018-04-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-04-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4031 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Authors added Benson; Dziedzic; Kent