MN HF445 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Author added Bahr
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Office of Inspector General created.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Inspector General created.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseAuthor added Bahr
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Theis
2019-03-21HouseAuthor added Poston
2019-03-20HouseAuthors added Miller, Layman, Koznick, Anderson, Robbins, Fabian, Neu, Zerwas, Petersburg, Gruenhagen, Baker, Johnson, Munson, Runbeck, Hertaus, Haley, Bennett, and Heintzeman
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Grossell
2019-02-25HouseAuthor added West
2019-02-21HouseAuthor added Albright
2019-01-28HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback