MN HF4444 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Misclassification of employees prohibited, penalties imposed, and data classified.
Title
Misclassification of employees prohibited, penalties imposed, and data classified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Laid on table |
2024-04-26 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 29, 2024 |
2024-04-24 | House | Author added Curran |
2024-04-18 | House | Second reading |
2024-04-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2024-04-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2024-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2024-03-11 | House | Authors added Freiberg; Youakim; Lee, K. |
2024-03-07 | House | Authors added Smith and Virnig |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government Finance and Policy |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor and Industry Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4483 (Similar To) 2024-04-24 - Second reading