MN HF444 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Boe
Pending: House Industrial Education and Economic Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Boe
Pending: House Industrial Education and Economic Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State-declared disaster definition restricted to exclude civil unrest.
Title
State-declared disaster definition restricted to exclude civil unrest.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Pelowski [D] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Brian Johnson [R] | Rep. John Burkel [R] |
Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Boe |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Lucero |
2021-02-22 | House | Author added Kiel |
2021-02-11 | House | Author added Drazkowski |
2021-02-10 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Industrial Education and Economic Development Finance and Policy |
2021-02-10 | House | Author added Burkel |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
Same As/Similar To
SF7 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Second reading