MN HF4410 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Enforcement authority modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Enforcement authority modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
2024-03-20 | House | Author added Curran |
2024-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4433 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration