MN HF441 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Employees and officers of local public pension plans required to report unlawful actions to the state auditor.
Title
Employees and officers of local public pension plans required to report unlawful actions to the state auditor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2013-04-22 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2013-04-20 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF 324 |
2013-03-06 | House | Second reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2013-02-21 | House | Author added Murphy, E. |
2013-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |