MN HF4385 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Secretary of State Chapter 172
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Secretary of State Chapter 172
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus tax bill.
Title
Omnibus tax bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 34 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 78 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House: (Y: 76 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House: Passage (Y: 90 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 50 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 49 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 47 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 77 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 78 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House: (Y: 76 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House: Passage (Y: 90 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 50 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 49 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 47 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 77 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Secretary of State Chapter 172 | |
2018-05-17 | Governor's action Veto | |
2018-05-16 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Third reading vote: 34-33 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2018-05-16 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2018-05-16 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2018-05-15 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 78-50 |
2018-05-15 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2018-05-15 | House | Motion prevailed |
2018-05-15 | House | Motion to adopt conference committee report |
2018-05-15 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2018-05-15 | House | Joint rule 2.06 - twelve hour rule suspended |
2018-05-15 | House | Motion prevailed |
2018-05-15 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2018-05-08 | House | Senate conferees Chamberlain; Dahms; Anderson, P.; Pratt; Johnson |
2018-05-08 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2018-05-07 | House | House conferees Davids, McDonald, Hertaus, Erickson, Marquart |
2018-05-07 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2018-05-07 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate conferees Chamberlain; Dahms; Anderson, P.; Pratt; Johnson |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2018-05-07 | Senate | House conferees Davids; McDonald; Hertaus; Erickson; Marquart |
2018-05-07 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 34-32 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Received from House |
2018-04-30 | House | Authors stricken Youakim and Loeffler. |
2018-04-30 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 90-38 |
2018-04-30 | House | Third reading as amended |
2018-04-30 | House | Point of order raised, ruled not well taken |
2018-04-30 | House | Amended |
2018-04-26 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 30, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Second reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2018-04-25 | House | Author added Christensen. |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2018-04-24 | House | Author stricken Schultz. |
2018-04-16 | House | Authors added Schultz and Youakim. |
2018-04-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF3982 (Similar To) 2018-04-16 - Referred to Taxes