MN HF4375 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Early childhood learning; provisions modified relating to public school age verification for admission, eligibility for early learning scholarships, and interagency early intervention committees.
Title
Early childhood learning; provisions modified relating to public school age verification for admission, eligibility for early learning scholarships, and interagency early intervention committees.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-11 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-05-07 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3313 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Author added Franzen