MN HF436 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Agriculture and Food Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Agriculture and Food Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Good food access account from general fund money transferred.
Title
Good food access account from general fund money transferred.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Acomb |
2019-03-14 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Christensen |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Mann |
2019-02-11 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2019-02-07 | House | Authors added Schultz and Lueck |
2019-02-04 | House | Authors added Wagenius, Wazlawik, and Youakim |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Agriculture and Food Finance and Policy Division |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1354 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance