MN HF4344 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Author added Reyer
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Author added Reyer
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State soldiers assistance program education benefits provisions modified.
Title
State soldiers assistance program education benefits provisions modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Nathan Coulter [D] | Rep. Mary Clardy [D] | Rep. Bianca Virnig [D] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] |
Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Liz Reyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Author added Reyer |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
2024-03-04 | House | Authors added Clardy; Virnig; Stephenson; Xiong |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF5102 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Referred to State and Local Government and Veterans