MN HF433 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Authors added Mortensen and Bahr
Pending: House Agriculture Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Minnesota Food Freedom Act established, homemade food sellers exempted from statutes, and local ordinance application to homemade food sellers preempted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minnesota Food Freedom Act established, homemade food sellers exempted from statutes, and local ordinance application to homemade food sellers preempted.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04HouseAuthors added Mortensen and Bahr
2021-02-25HouseAuthor added Lucero
2021-01-28HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1941 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback