MN HF433 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-26 - House: Author added Sertich
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-26 - House: Author added Sertich
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medal of Honor Day designated as March 25.
Title
Medal of Honor Day designated as March 25.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Newton [D] | Rep. Michael Obermueller [D] | Sen. Roger Reinert [D] | Rep. Paul Rosenthal [D] |
Rep. Anthony Sertich [D] | Rep. Phillip Sterner [D] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-26 | House: Author added Sertich | |
2009-03-13 | House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to Agriculture, Rural Economies and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-05 | House: Authors added Urdahl and Reinert | |
2009-02-03 | House: Referred by Chair to Veterans Affairs Division | |
2009-02-02 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture, Rural Economies and Veterans Affairs |